Financial history KENT YOUTH NETBALL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 294964
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £78 £79 £68 £68 £58
Total expenditure £30 £672 £312 £331 £413
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A