Accounts and annual returns THE MARIE-LUISE CHARITY FOR INCURABLE DISEASES

Charity number: 294967
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2007 17 July 2008 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required