Financial history THE ZAIREAN REFUGEE ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 295002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £171.97k £600 £1.30k £500 £260
Total expenditure £250 £100 £100 £250 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A