Accounts and annual returns BURPHAM ASSOCIATION SUPPORTING INDEPENDENT LIVING(B.A.S.I.L.)

Charity number: 295017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 August 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required