Accounts and annual returns PLYMOUTH THEATRE ROYAL APPLAUSE CLUB

Charity number: 295129
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 29 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 02 November 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 01 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 21 August 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 17 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 23 December 2013 On Time