Financial history SYWELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 295196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.19k £25.19k £17.44k £10.13k £15.14k
Total expenditure £9.50k £10.00k £12.23k £11.68k £25.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.60k £10.67k N/A N/A