Financial history RINGWOOD DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES

Charity number: 295422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.80k £2.00k £4.00k £3.28k £4.89k
Total expenditure £2.65k £2.40k £500 £4.67k £3.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A