Governing document KPMG (NORTH EAST PARTNERSHIP) CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity Number: 295478
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 14 FEBRUARY 1986 AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS EXECUTED 30 JUNE 1987, 10 JANUARY 1990, 14 JANUARY 1992 AND 20 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHERESOEVER IN THE WORLD THE SAME SHALL BE ESTABLISHED OR CARRIED ON AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.