Financial history THE NSA WILDLIFE SOUND TRUST

Charity number: 295776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.44k £2.68k £1.90k £2.10k £1.40k
Total expenditure £95 £0 £25 £60 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A