Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE EAST SUSSEX RECORD OFFICE

Charity number: 296062
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 20 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 11 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 11 May 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2011 12 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required