Financial history EASTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 296189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.81k £20.98k £13.02k £12.34k £15.45k
Total expenditure £9.24k £5.32k £42.43k £15.16k £10.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.37k £4.92k N/A £750