Accounts and annual returns THE UNITY TEACHING AND HEALING TRUST

Charity Number: 296405
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2010 25 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 16 April 2010 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 22 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not submitted