Financial history GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH GLASTONBURY

Charity number: 296437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £68.70k £42.75k £47.01k £46.75k £57.42k
Total expenditure £75.52k £46.46k £47.99k £42.17k £54.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A