Accounts and annual returns POST MERIDIAN (KINGSTEIGNTON) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 296718
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 03 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 28 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 07 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 25 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required