Financial history WORLDWIDE PEOPLE FOR PEOPLE

Charity number: 297118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £71.25k £65.48k £58.51k £50.25k £45.16k
Total expenditure £57.44k £72.48k £72.20k £42.40k £39.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A