Accounts and annual returns COSTESSEY HIGH SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 297133
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 17 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 21 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 16 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 16 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 12 September 2008 On Time