Financial history Dewan-e-Hazoori Trust

Charity number: 297396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.16k £9.91k £9.53k £8.56k £8.38k
Total expenditure £2.58k £9.60k £1.56k £2.33k £764
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A