Financial history CITY DISCOVERY CENTRE

Charity number: 297397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £280.58k £409.44k £245.92k £350.83k £377.37k
Total expenditure £310.56k £380.80k £287.80k £318.90k £397.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.00k £49.28k £89.42k £53.00k £65.00k