Accounts and annual returns SPRINGBOARD BROMLEY TRUST

Charity number: 297631
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 11 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2014 21 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2013 14 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 14 May 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 31 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 31 January 2013 On Time