Governing document BOW CHILDCARE
Charity number: 297841
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 AUGUST 1987 AS AMENDED 28 MARCH 2001, 1 DECEMBER 2008, 5 DECEMBER 2008 AND 3 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UP TO THE AGE OF FOURTEEN (I) BY PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS TAKE PART WHEN APPROPRIATE: AND (II) BY ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
TOWER HAMLETS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.