Financial history SOUTH BROMLEY FORUM

Charity number: 297918
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £66.90k £90.00k £73.85k £78.01k £66.73k
Total expenditure £89.26k £89.00k £68.61k £83.10k £69.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A