NATIONAL AIDS TRUST

Charity number: 297977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote public health through effective HIV prevention and early diagnosis of HIV infection; to promote the rights, dignity, health and wellbeing of people affected by HIV, or at risk of HIV infection, in the UK; to advance the education of the public in general in order to increase awareness and understanding of HIV and AIDS and eradicate HIV-related stigma, discrimination and inequality.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR JANE ANDERSON Chair 20 November 2014
FACULTY OF CONFLICT AND CATASTROPHE MEDICINE OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
HIV.NET
Received: On time
PAINTINGS IN HOSPITALS
Received: 56 days late
Professor Matthew John Weait Trustee 19 April 2025
None on record
David Neil Sparks Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Dr Alessandro Ceccarelli Trustee 24 January 2023
MERTHYR TYDFIL COLLEGE LIMITED
Received: On time
CONSORTIUM OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS
Received: On time
FAST TRACK CYMRU
Recently registered
Dr Ann Kathleen Sullivan Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
John Ceri Edwards Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
STEPHEN CRAMPTON-HAYWARD Trustee 18 December 2019
None on record
Gary Christie Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Angelina Namiba Trustee 30 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £781.39k £738.52k £823.59k £1.14m £1.39m
Total expenditure £933.65k £888.86k £975.75k £1.13m £1.37m
Income from government contracts £12.96k N/A N/A N/A £101.93k
Income from government grants N/A £68.97k £275 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £689.07k £833.08k £663.45k £820.59k £1.09m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £85.31k £160.61k £157.24k £307.76k £282.94k
Income - Endowments £0 £259.24k £0 £2.43k £0
Income - Investment £7.01k £4.07k £2.90k £7.75k £21.77k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £43.13k £25.20k £82.65k £39.98k £591.67k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £770.26k £752.64k £781.59k £844.38k £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £163.39k £136.22k £194.17k £289.22k £282.41k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £52.99k £0 £62.04k £62.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £20.55k £16.70k £10.55k £18.79k £20.67k
Long-term investments £0 £259.24k £259.24k £260.83k £265.23k
Other assets £1.08m £896.69k £697.48k £814.45k £886.90k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £147.40k £114.81k £61.60k £185.90k £245.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 12 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 12 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 14 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NATIONAL AIDS TRUST
The Green House
244-254 Cambridge Heath Road
London
E2 9DA
Phone:
02078146767