Accounts and annual returns THE SILVERMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 298016
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 March 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required