Accounts and annual returns ARC DANCE COMPANY

Charity number: 298044
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2009 14 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2008 09 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2007 14 July 2008 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2007 28 March 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2006 29 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2006 30 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2005 30 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2005 30 March 2006 On Time