Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE YESHIVAT HAR ETZION TRUST

Charity number: 298814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £136.14k £132.15k £111.46k £133.13k £53.52k
Total expenditure £910 £200.96k £100.93k £95.93k £101.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A