Accounts and annual returns THE NEW ASSEMBLY OF CHURCHES

Charity number: 298841
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 21 May 2015 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 03 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 07 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required