Financial history CALNE CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP

Charity Number: 298889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £24.55k £13.66k £20.61k £24.77k £23.23k
Total expenditure £23.50k £18.48k £17.59k £21.19k £27.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A