Financial history OPERA SOUTH EAST

Charity number: 298946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £14.72k £11.39k £7.73k £14.13k £19.47k
Total expenditure £16.17k £13.34k £6.46k £10.88k £12.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A