Financial history NEWBURY NOMADS

Charity number: 299160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £40.43k £6.65k £7.18k £29.15k £54.43k
Total expenditure £36.71k £4.41k £7.07k £30.92k £52.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A