Accounts and annual returns MENCAP HALES HOUSE

Charity number: 299253
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2006 08 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2004 26 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required