Financial history THE FORT PITT GRAMMAR SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 299551
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/04/2011 08/04/2012 08/04/2013 08/04/2014 08/04/2015
Total gross income £2.26k £1.92k £1.47k £1.31k £6.45k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A