Financial history HUNTLEY STREET CHARITY

Charity Number: 299617
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £75.89k
Total expenditure £27.37k £27.37k £27.37k £27.37k £426.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A