Accounts and annual returns THE DAVID RYMER CHARITY

Charity number: 299634
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 01 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 11 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 13 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 14 September 2005 On Time