Governing document BEDFORD CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Charity number: 300001
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 10TH JUNE 1965 LEASE DATED 7TH JULY 1969 AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 1994 AND AS AMENDED ON 26 MARCH 1997, AS AMENDED 22ND MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES, PREDOMINANTLY THROUGH SINGLE-GENDER WORK SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND MORAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL BOTH AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BEDFORD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.