Financial history Blunham Sports and Social Club (BSSC)

Charity number: 300009
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 31/12/2023
Total gross income £46.48k £12.81k £46.70k £41.43k £55.01k
Total expenditure £44.06k £17.29k £44.13k £51.06k £50.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A