Accounts and annual returns TRURO BOYS' CLUB

Charity number: 300643
Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required