Trustees LEIGH VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301144

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Sanderson | Chair | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Bourne | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Sanderson | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Read | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Goodfellow | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Ford | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Morris | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ARTHUR READ | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MORRIS | Trustee | 26 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR STEVE FUDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.