Financial history VILLAGE HALL, ASHEN

Charity number: 301236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £101.76k £1.04k £2.32k £5.94k £16.78k
Total expenditure £7.46k £2.56k £76.79k £6.66k £15.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A