Financial history TUFFLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 301538
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.89k £24.27k £26.00k £24.25k £30.87k
Total expenditure £27.45k £22.79k £18.95k £23.89k £31.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.98k £19.19k N/A N/A