Financial history GUITING POWER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.08k £22.63k £16.51k £7.37k £11.52k
Total expenditure £5.48k £4.88k £5.17k £10.83k £6.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.67k N/A N/A