Accounts and annual returns ULEY PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 301642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 November 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required