Financial history BEAR CROSS ESTATE PLEASURE GROUND

Charity number: 301754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £874 £961 £957 £1.01k
Total expenditure £0 £874 £961 £957 £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A