Trustees COLBURY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 301786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Kevin Smith Trustee 27 September 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Lesley Bonnin Trustee 16 August 2024
None on record
David Charles Bryant Trustee 26 April 2024
None on record
Timothy James Richardson Trustee 22 July 2021
None on record
David John Charmer Trustee 20 September 2019
None on record
Caroline Hubbard Trustee 05 July 2019
None on record
MRS M BRYANT Trustee
None on record