Financial history CRAWLEY VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 301792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.00k £4.59k £23.33k £21.33k £22.66k
Total expenditure £10.40k £8.59k £10.42k £19.63k £30.92k
Income from government contracts £360 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.57k £2.67k N/A