Financial history THE KEMPSHOTT VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.38k £73.46k £36.60k £77.38k £61.62k
Total expenditure £35.83k £66.23k £45.77k £56.45k £53.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.96k £48.02k £8.23k £2.00k N/A