Trustees PLAITFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 301925

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH PEARCE | Chair | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Charles Holliwell Pratt | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Moore | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ross Paul Stanton | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Biddle | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Cook | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Shiela Ruth Cuell | Trustee | 18 April 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.