Accounts and annual returns WINNALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 301998
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 February 2021 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On Time