Financial history CHESHUNT BOYS' CLUB

Charity number: 302350
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £20.85k £20.82k £21.46k £14.45k £22.14k
Total expenditure £19.38k £23.98k £24.61k £13.76k £53.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0