Financial history YAXLEY PUBLIC HALL

Charity Number: 302667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £8.81k £5.82k £1.65k £8.34k £9.90k
Total expenditure £8.69k £6.21k £4.56k £7.03k £11.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A