Accounts and annual returns OTFORD RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 302814
Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required